IL HB1471 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning endangering the life or health of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-08HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Table Amendment - Prevailed
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 007-005-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-21.6Amended CodeCitation Text
720512C-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback