IL HB1469 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the sexual exploitation of children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-27HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-9.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback