IL HB1468 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-27 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Response) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the unlawful sale of public conveyance travel tickets to a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-27HouseBill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
2018-05-16HouseAmendatory Veto Motion - Motion Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseAmendatory Veto Motion - Motion Filed Accept Amendatory Veto Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto
2018-05-14HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-03-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-03-14HousePassed Both Houses
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-03-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-015-000
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-02-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-037-000
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720510-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback