IL HB1467 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning first degree murder.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 83 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-03-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-016-003 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 083-031-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 9-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |