IL HB1465 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning conspiracy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-03-14HouseArrived in House
2018-03-14SenateThird Reading - Passed; 033-022-002
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz
2018-03-14SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2018-03-14SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018
2018-03-13SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-03-02SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2018-03-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-02-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-02-28SenateArrive in Senate
2018-02-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-02-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72058-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback