IL HB1465 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning conspiracy.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 33 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 51 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-03-14 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 033-022-002 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Muñoz |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-02-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-051-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-02-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-26 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 8-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |