IL HB1464 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Government Energy Conservation Act. Changes the definition of "unit of local government" to be consistent with the Illinois Constitution's definition, except that "unit of local government" also includes a school district as used in the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV ENERGY CONSERVATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
505155Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback