IL HB1464 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning justification in the use of force against another person in defense of a dwelling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
2018-02-14SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-01-25SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-10-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-10-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-000
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-24HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-10-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
72057-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback