IL HB1464 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning justification in the use of force against another person in defense of a dwelling.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0630 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2017-10-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-008-000 |
2017-10-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-001-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-10-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |