IL HB1462 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Children's Mental Health Ombudsman Program Act. Provides that the Children's Mental Health Ombudsman Program (Program) is created in the Office of the Governor for specified purposes, including for the purposes of advocating on behalf of children with mental health disorders, identifying barriers to effective mental health treatment and proposed solutions; monitoring and ensuring compliance with relevant statutes, regulations, rules, and policies pertaining to children's behavioral health services; and investigating complaints that a State or a government agency has engaged in activities, practices, or omissions that constitute violations of applicable court orders, statutes, or regulations or that may have an adverse effect upon the health, safety, welfare, or rights of children. Provides that the Governor shall appoint the Children's Mental Health Ombudsman (Ombudsman). Requires the Ombudsman, in consultation with other specified persons, to establish policies and procedures as needed to facilitate compliance with the provisions of the Program, including procedures for filing, investigating, and resolving complaints. Grants the Ombudsman subpoena powers. Requires the Ombudsman to: (i) monitor federal, State, and local statutes, rules, regulations, and policies regarding services and supports for children with mental health disorders; (ii) maintain complete records of complaints received; (iii) submit annual reports to the Governor and the General Assembly on the activities of the Program; (iv) adopt rules that are necessary for performing the required activities of the Program; and other matters. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from disclosure all information and records acquired by the Ombudsman during the performance of his or her duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILDREN-MENTAL HLTH OMBUDSMAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-15HouseTo Family Law Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback