IL HB1459 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nurse Practice Act. Ratifies and approves the Nurse Licensure Compact, which allows for the issuance of multistate licenses that allow nurses to practice in their home state and other compact states. Provides that the Compact does not supersede existing State labor laws.
Title
NURSE LICENSURE COMPACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-07-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2020-03-05 | House | To Workforce Development Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-24 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 65 | 85-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 85-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | Art. 85 heading | New Code | See Bill Text |