IL HB1455 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Disposition of Remains Act. Provides that any dispute concerning the right to control the disposition of a decedent's remains shall be resolved by a court within 30 days of the dispute being filed with the court.
Title
DISPUTES OVER REMAINS
Sponsors
Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0381 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-02 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-13 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-15 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 65 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |