IL HB1454 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning noise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 To Environmental Regulations Subcommittee
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-04-25HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-04-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415524Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback