IL HB1453 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning the designation of a candidate's name on a nomination petition or ballot shall require a candidate to use his or her spouse's surname after marriage or to return to his or her previous legal surname following a dissolution of marriage.
Title
ELEC CD-CANDIDATE SURNAMES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 7-10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1453&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1453.htm |