IL HB1445 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. Authorizes organization licensees to offer wagering on standardbred, quarter horse, and thoroughbred historical horse races. Requires the prior written approval of the Illinois Racing Board. Provides guidelines for the conduct of wagering on historical horse races. Defines "historical horse race", "initial seed pool", "seed pool", and "terminal". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HISTORICAL HORSE RACE-WAGERING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230526Amended CodeCitation Text
230526.10New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.32New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.33New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.34New CodeSee Bill Text
23053.35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback