IL HB1445 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Rural/Downstate Health Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-06-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen
2018-05-31HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-31HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-001-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-05-14HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-14HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
410651Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback