IL HB1445 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Rural/Downstate Health Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-06-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-06-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-31 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-001-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 65 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |