IL HB1443 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Community Health Center Expansion Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the reporting requirement for grant recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 93 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 093-016-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-22HouseArrived in House
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler
2018-05-22SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-15SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-009-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health Committee; 016-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-19HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-16HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106625Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback