IL HB1440 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Sexual Assault Evidence Submission Act. Provides that the State Police shall by rule establish a sexual assault evidence tracking system that conforms to the recommendations made by the Sexual Assault Evidence Tracking and Reporting Commission in its report dated June 26, 2018. Provides that the Department of State Police shall design the criteria for the sexual assault evidence tracking system so that, to the extent reasonably possible, the system can use existing technologies and products. Provides that the sexual assault evidence tracking system shall be operational no later than than one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a treatment hospital, a treatment hospital with approved pediatric transfer, an out-of-state hospital approved by the Department of Public Health to receive transfers of Illinois sexual assault survivors, or an approved pediatric health care facility must comply with rules relating to the collection and tracking of sexual assault evidence adopted by the Department of State Police. Provides for the operations of the sexual assault tracking system to be funded by appropriations from the State Crime Laboratory Fund, together with asset forfeiture and other funds appropriated by the General Assembly. Authorizes emergency rulemaking. Exempts information in the sexual assault evidence tracking system from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act, the Freedom of Information Act, the Sexual Assault Survivors Emergency Treatment Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRACK-SEXUAL ASSAULT EVIDENCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-27HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2019-03-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2019-03-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-02-13HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-02-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-02-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-01-29HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-28HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
410705Amended CodeCitation Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
72520250New CodeSee Bill Text
73055-9-1.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback