IL HB1439 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Makes a technical change in a Section relating to fees.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Grant Wehrli [R] | Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0613 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date July 20, 2018 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-10 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 014-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |