IL HB1439 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0613
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Makes a technical change in a Section relating to fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0613
2018-07-20HouseEffective Date July 20, 2018
2018-07-20HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-08HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-10HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 014-000-000
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-03HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback