IL HB1438 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
SAFETY-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-06-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-06-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Environment |
2017-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-06-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-06-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-30 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-05-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
420 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |