IL HB1437 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the State of Illinois ratifies and approves the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact. Provides that the purpose of the Compact is to facilitate interstate practice of physical therapy with the goal of improving public access to physical therapy services, and states that the Compact preserves the regulatory authority of states to protect public health and safety through the current system of state licensure. In the Compact, contains provisions concerning definitions, state participation in the Compact, active duty military personnel and their spouses, adverse actions, establishment of the Physical Therapy Compact Commission, a data system, rulemaking, oversight, dispute resolution, and enforcement, date of implementation, withdrawal, construction, and severability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICAL THERAPY COMPACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2023-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
2023-02-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2023-02-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2259033.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback