IL HB1429 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning prohibited transactions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC EMPLOYEE BENEFITS-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-23HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-21HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2021-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick
2021-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2021-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2021-04-14HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2021-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2021-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2021-03-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
2021-03-02HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4051-110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback