IL HB1424 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section describing the termination of the AFDC program and the beginning of the TANF program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC AID-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 68 N: 45 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-30SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-30SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 068-045-001
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-30HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-05-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-05-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-05-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-05-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 007-004-000
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-05-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-15HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-05-15HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30554-0.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback