IL HB1410 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-12-02 | First Reading | |
2010-11-29 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2010-11-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-11-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 | |
2010-11-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-11-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-11-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 016-000-000 | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-11-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-11-10 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 | |
2010-11-10 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 11, 2011 | |
2010-11-09 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-11-09 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2009-03-03 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-19 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-02-17 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-17 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |