IL HB1399 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that in an effort to control the epidemic of childhood obesity, the Secretary of Human Services may seek a waiver from the United States Department of Agriculture to allow the State to specify certain foods that may and may not be purchased in Illinois with the benefits funded by the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) (formerly the Food Stamps Program). Requires the Secretary to consult with members of the General Assembly in developing the waiver and to obtain approval from the General Assembly before implementing the waiver.
Title
DHS-FOOD STAMPS-CHILD OBESITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1399&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1399.htm |