IL HB1384 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-03 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if there is excess money remaining in a special service area fund at the end of a fiscal year, then the corporate authorities may use that excess money to provide special services within the special service area in the next fiscal year, provided that the total amount used may not exceed 25% of the previous fiscal year's budget for the special service area. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SPECIAL SERVICE AREA-ROLL OVER

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-03HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2016-11-15HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 008-000-000
2016-11-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-11-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-11-09HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-04-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-08HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2016-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
2016-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2016-03-31HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2016-03-23HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2016-03-23HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-02-26HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3520027-92New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback