IL HB1362 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0034
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Solid Waste Management Act. Provides that all State agencies responsible for the maintenance of public lands in the State shall review their procurement specifications and policies to determine (1) if incorporating compost materials will help reduce stormwater run-off and increase infiltration of moisture in land maintenance activities and (2) the current recycled content usage and potential for additional recycled content usage by the Agency in land maintenance activities and report to the General Assembly by December 15, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
WASTE MGMT-AGENCY RECYCLING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0034 |
2015-07-14 | House | Effective Date July 14, 2015 |
2015-07-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2015 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2015-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-02-10 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emily McAsey |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |