IL HB1346 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that grants shall not restrict the amount of money used to pay for fringe benefits. Provides that grants shall not restrict administrative costs to less than 20% of the grant award. Defines "fringe benefits".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GATA-GRANT LIMITATIONS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-03-22HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-22HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2023-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
2023-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30708135New CodeSee Bill Text
3070815Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback