IL HB1338 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0612
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning accident and health policies.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0612 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |