IL HB1338 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning accident and health policies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155355Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback