IL HB1337 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section relating to long-term care insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 008-002-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-04-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155351A-4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback