IL HB1336 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning arbitration of medical malpractice disputes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass as Amended Insurance; 012-000-000
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Insurance
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-19HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Property & Casualty Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155155.20Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback