IL HB1333 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the purpose of the Article regarding nonprofit risk organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Standard Debate
2017-04-25HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-03-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-007-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Insurance: Health & Life Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2155123D-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback