IL HB1332 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0305
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 34 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0305 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 074-034-001 |
2017-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2017-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-05-15 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-05-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Lost 008-007-001 |
2017-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 009-007-000 |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-03-15 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |