IL HB1299 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law in the Property Tax Code. Provides that the question of establishing a maximum aggregate extension may be combined with the question of forming or establishing a new taxing district. Contains referendum language.
Title
PTELL-AGGREGATE EXT-FORMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-25 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1149 |
2013-01-25 | House | Effective Date June 1, 2013 |
2013-01-25 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-12-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-12-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 28, 2012 |
2012-11-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-04-17 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2011 |
2011-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2011-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-02-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-210 | Amended Code | Citation Text |