IL HB1298 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 3 @ 8:30 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Hearing: Apr 3 @ 8:30 am in Room D-1 Stratton Building
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Removes provisions allowing the Department of Human Services to conduct site visits to an agency licensed under the Act, or to any program or placement certified by the agency, and inspect the records or premises, or both, of such agency, program or placement as it deems appropriate, for the purpose of determining compliance with the Act, the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code, and applicable Department rules and regulations. Requires the Department to establish a system of regular and ongoing on-site inspections, that shall occur at least annually, of each agency licensed under the Act or any program or placement certified by an agency licensed under the Act under the Department's jurisdiction. Provides that the inspections shall be conducted by the Department's central office to achieve specified goals.
Title
COMMUNITY-INTEGRATED LIVING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2024-02-29 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-10-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Special Issues Subcommittee |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2023-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |