IL HB1295 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-03 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Natural Resources Congress Act. Creates the Natural Resource Congress in order to protect, conserve, and appropriately use the natural resources of the State; to ensure that opportunities are available for the enjoyment of natural resources; and to enhance the quality of life of all of the present and future citizens of Illinois. Creates the Natural Resources Council, a committee comprised of the Directors of certain natural resource related State agencies. Requires the Natural Resources Congress to make certain recommendations to the Natural Resources Council. Effective immediately.
Title
DNR--CONGRESS/DIR. SELECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2009-02-11 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1295&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1295.htm |