IL HB1293 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the College Planning Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EDUCATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-08HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-08HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 012-007-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-16HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110171Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback