IL HB1290 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equal Pay Act of 2003. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning enforcement.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2016-04-18 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Judicial Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed as Amended |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-010-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2016-04-06 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2015-12-04 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-10-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015 |
2015-09-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-08-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) September 30, 2015 |
2015-07-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2015 |
2015-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 31, 2015 |
2015-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015 |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-12 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-12 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 112 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |