IL HB1279 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning violations of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-08HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0559
2017-12-08HouseEffective Date December 8, 2017
2017-12-08HouseGovernor Approved
2017-12-07HouseSent to the Governor
2017-11-08HousePassed Both Houses
2017-11-08SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2017-11-08Senate3/5 Vote Required
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 8, 2017
2017-11-07SenateSecond Reading
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2017-11-07SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
2017-11-01SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2017-11-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-11-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-01SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-11-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-11-01SenateArrive in Senate
2017-10-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
2017-10-25House3/5 Vote Required
2017-10-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-10-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
2017-10-24HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017
2017-10-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-10-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-10-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-10-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-10-17HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-10-17HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20551011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback