IL HB1277 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Credit Union Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the fiscal year of credit unions.
Title
REGULATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. John Curran [R] |
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Re-assigned to Insurance |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2017-11-08 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-11-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-10-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-10-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-10-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-10-24 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |