IL HB1274 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Savings and Loan Share and Account Act. Makes a technical change to a Section relating to joint ownership of accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-04HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-30HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2051152Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback