IL HB1273 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the primary powers of banks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

REGULATION-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseTotal Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
2018-05-08HousePlaced on Calendar Total Veto
2018-04-27HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-01HouseSent to the Governor
2018-02-28HousePassed Both Houses
2018-02-28HouseHouse Concurs
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 064-051-000
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
2018-02-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-28HouseArrived in House
2018-02-28SenateThird Reading - Passed; 030-023-000
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
2018-02-28SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-02-28SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-01-25SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-12-10SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-11-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2017-10-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-10-18SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2017
2017-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2017-05-09SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20553Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback