IL HB1272 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment Article and the Real Estate Transactions Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation: (1) for any employer, employee, agent of any employer, employment agency, labor organization, or public employer to inquire about a job applicant's gender; and (2) for an owner or any other person engaging in a real estate transaction, or for a real estate broker or salesman, to inquire about a buyer's or renter's gender.
Title
GENDER INQUIRY-EMPLOY/HOUSING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 3-102.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1272&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1272.htm |