IL HB1268 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-01 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0280
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following change. Provides that a person who has been convicted of a felony is qualified to act as an executor if, among other criteria, the person was not previously convicted of financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability, financial identity theft, or a similar crime in another state or in federal court.
Title
PROBATE-EXECUTOR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 80 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 26 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0280 |
2023-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2023-05-18 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-18 | House | House Concurs |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 House Concurs 080-034-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 080-034-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-034-000 |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-05-17 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-15 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 4 |
2023-05-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-008-000 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Johnson |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2023 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-03-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-026-000 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2023-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-002-000 |
2023-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2023-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2023-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-003-000 |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2023-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 6-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |