IL HB1261 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employee Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for service on or after July 1, 2013, "compensation" does not include any overtime pay payable to an employee for personal services performed in excess of the full normal working period for his or her position. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SERS-OVERTIME PAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1261&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB1261.htm |