IL HB1255 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Local Government Business Anti-Poaching Act. Provides that no municipality or county shall offer after the effective date of the Act any incentive to a business or corporation to move its headquarters located in Illinois, or any part of its business located in Illinois, away from the current location. Defines "incentive". Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL BUSINESS ANTI-POACHING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback