IL HB1254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0028
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the State Board of Education.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. Brandon Phelps [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Sen. Paul Schimpf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-04 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0028 |
2017-08-04 | House | Effective Date August 4, 2017 |
2017-08-04 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-12 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-27 | House | Re-assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-2.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |